MS HB245 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-05 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-05 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 9-13-19, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That Court Reporters For Circuit And Chancery Courts Shall Shall Accrue And Receive Personal Leave And Major Medical Leave The Same As Other State Employees Do; To Provide That All Lawfully Credited Unused Personal And Major Medical Leave Of Those Court Reporters Shall Be Reported And Credited For Retirement Purposes; To Amend Sections 9-13-15 And 9-13-17, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform To The Preceding Provisions; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Court reporters; shall receive personal and major medical leave.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Baker [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-02-07 - House - House Passed (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-05 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Referred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency;Appropriations |
2013-02-11 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2013-02-07 | House | Passed |
2013-02-07 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2013-01-31 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2013-01-31 | House | DR - TSDPCS: AP To JA |
2013-01-29 | House | DR - TSDPCS: JA To AP |
2013-01-14 | House | Referred To Judiciary A;Appropriations |