MS HB231 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-15 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-15 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 41-26-13, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Public Notification Requirement For Public Water Systems By Requiring The Public Notice To Be Provided To The State Department Of Health For Publication On Its Web Site; To Require The Public Water System To Provide Notice In Certain Newspapers That The Drinking Water Quality Reports Are Available On The State Department Of Health Web Site; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Drinking water quality reports; revise public notification requirements.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Baker [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-03 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-03 - House - House Passed (Y: 120 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-03 - House - House Passed (Y: 120 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | Approved by Governor | |
2010-03-09 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-03-09 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-03-04 | Transmitted To House | |
2010-03-03 | Passed | |
2010-02-25 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2010-02-08 | Referred To Environment Prot, Cons and Water Res | |
2010-02-04 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2010-02-03 | Passed | |
2010-01-21 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2010-01-05 | Referred To Conservation and Water Resources |