MS HB211 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 27-104-205, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Remove The Requirement That The Department Of Insurance Be Funded By Appropriations From The General Fund; To Amend Sections 83-1-27, 83-2-33, 83-2-35, 83-5-17, 83-5-41, 83-5-45, 83-5-69, 83-5-72, 83-5-73, 83-5-77, 83-9-3, 83-17-71, 83-17-519, 83-19-21, 83-21-1, 83-37-29, 83-39-3 And 83-73-9, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Delete The Provisions Of Law Requiring Certain Expenses Of The Department Of Insurance To Be Defrayed By Appropriation From The State General Fund; To Provide That All Unexpended Amounts Remaining In The Insurance Department Fund Above The Sum Of $500,000.00 At The End Of Each Fiscal Year Shall Lapse Into The State General Fund; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Insurance Department; remove from the provisions of the Mississippi Budget Transparency and Simplification Act.
Sponsors
Rep. John Read [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-03 - House - House Passed (Y: 116 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-02 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Referred To Appropriations |
2021-02-03 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2021-02-03 | House | Immediate Release |
2021-02-03 | House | Passed |
2021-02-03 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2021-01-28 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2021-01-15 | House | Referred To Appropriations |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
27 | 104 | 205 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
83 | 1 | 27 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
83 | 17 | 519 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
83 | 17 | 71 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
83 | 19 | 21 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
83 | 2 | 33 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
83 | 2 | 35 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
83 | 21 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
83 | 37 | 29 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
83 | 39 | 3 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
83 | 5 | 17 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
83 | 5 | 41 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
83 | 5 | 45 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
83 | 5 | 69 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
83 | 5 | 72 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
83 | 5 | 73 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
83 | 5 | 77 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
83 | 73 | 9 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
83 | 9 | 3 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |