MS HB204 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-15 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-15 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 49-7-90, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Delete The Repealer On The Provisions That Authorize The Commission On Wildlife, Fisheries And Parks To Establish Permits And Fees For Taking Paddlefish; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Paddlefish; delete repealer on penalties for unlawful possession of.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Warren [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-03 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-03 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 118 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-03 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 118 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | Approved by Governor | |
2010-03-09 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-03-09 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-03-04 | Transmitted To House | |
2010-03-03 | Passed | |
2010-02-24 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2010-02-08 | Referred To Wildlife, Fisheries and Parks | |
2010-02-05 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2010-02-03 | Passed As Amended | |
2010-02-03 | Amended | |
2010-01-21 | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended | |
2010-01-05 | Referred To Wildlife, Fisheries and Parks |