MS HB20 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Passed on March 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-03 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Passed on March 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-03 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Enact Cole's Law To Prohibit Discrimination Against Recipients Of An Anatomical Gift Or Organ Transplant Based On Disability; To Define Certain Terms For The Act; To Provide Requirements For Covered Entities; To Provide For The Relief Provided By The Act; To Provide Certain Requirements Of Insurers; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Anatomical gifts; prohibit discrimination against recipient based on disability.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House Passed (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House Passed (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-03 | Approved by Governor | |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-02-24 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Passed |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Referred To Public Health and Welfare |
2022-02-04 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2022-02-03 | House | Passed |
2022-01-25 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2022-01-04 | House | Referred To Public Health and Human Services |