MS HB196 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 37-19-7, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Remove The Cap Placed On The Number Of Licensed Nurses With A Certificate From The National Board For Certification Of School Nurses, Inc., Who Are Eligible To Receive The Annual Salary Supplement Of $6,000.00; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Licensed school nurses; remove cap on those with National Board Certification eligible for annual salary supplement.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-02 | House | Died In Committee |
2016-03-02 | House | Recommitted to Committee |
2016-03-02 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2016-02-25 | House | Read the Third Time |
2016-02-23 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2016-02-08 | House | Referred To Revenue and Expenditure General Bills |