MS HB195 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 23-15-859, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize Any Municipality With A Population Of 2,500 Residents Or Less To Conduct A Special Election For Any Issue Or Candidate At One Centralized Polling Place; To Amend Section 23-15-557, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform To The Preceding Section; To Amend Section 23-15-300, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That Any Individual Having Met The Two-year Residency Requirement For Municipal Or County Office, Shall Only Reside In The Ward Of District Of Representation At The Time Of Qualifying For Such Office; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Municipalities; authorize those of certain size to conduct special elections at one polling place.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-11 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 110 N: 6 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-02SenateDied In Committee
2021-03-02SenateDR - TSDPAA: EL To MU
2021-02-22SenateReferred To Elections;Municipalities
2021-02-12HouseTransmitted To Senate
2021-02-11HousePassed As Amended
2021-02-11HouseAmended
2021-02-10HouseRead the Third Time
2021-02-02HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2021-02-02HouseDR - TSDP: MU To AE
2021-01-28HouseDR - TSDP: AE To MU
2021-01-14HouseReferred To Apportionment and Elections;Municipalities

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2315300Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2315557Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2315859Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback