MS HB1945 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 14 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-14 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 14 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-14 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Chapter 939, Local And Private Laws Of 1998, As Last Amended By Chapter 901, Local And Private Laws Of 2020, To Extend The Repeal Date From December 31, 2024, To December 31, 2028, On The Law That Authorizes The City Of Florence To Impose A Tax Upon The Gross Proceeds Of The Sales Of Bars And Restaurants; And For Related Purposes.
Title
City of Florence; extend repealer on bar and restaurant tax.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-14 | House | Died In Committee |
2024-03-25 | House | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |
Mississippi State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2024/pdf/history/HB/HB1945.xml |
Text | https://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2024/html/HB/1900-1999/HB1945IN.htm |