MS HB1943 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 14 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-14 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 14 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-14 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 27-69-3, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Define The Term "heated Tobacco Product" Under The Tobacco Tax Law; To Amend Section 27-69-13, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Levy An Excise Tax On Heated Tobacco Products Under The Tobacco Tax Law; To Amend Section 27-69-27, Mississippi Code Of 1972, In Conformity Thereto; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Tobacco; define "heated tobacco product" under tobacco tax law and provide for rate of excise tax.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-16 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 108 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 108 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-14 | House | Died In Conference |
2024-04-29 | Suspend from Deadlines by HC 64 | |
2024-04-19 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Amended |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Referred To Finance |
2024-03-29 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2024-03-28 | House | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2024-03-27 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Hobgood-Wilkes, Lamar, Steverson) |
2024-03-27 | House | Passed As Amended |
2024-03-27 | House | Amended |
2024-03-26 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2024-03-21 | House | Referred To Ways and Means |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
27 | 69 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
27 | 69 | 27 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
27 | 69 | 3 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |