MS HB193 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-30 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-30 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Provide That The Governing Authorities Of Any Municipality May Donate Funds To Any Chapter Of Court Appointed Special Advocates, Up To A Certain Maximum Per Fiscal Year; To Amend Section 19-5-93, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That The Boards Of Supervisors May Donate Funds To Any Chapter Of Court Appointed Special Advocates Or Any Chapter Of National Voluntary Organizations Active In Disaster, Up To A Certain Maximum Per Fiscal Year; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Cities and counties; authorize to donate to court appointed special advocates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-14 - House - House Concurred in Amend From Senate (Y: 116 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-08 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-03 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - House - House Passed (Y: 100 N: 18 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-08 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-03 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - House - House Passed (Y: 100 N: 18 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-30 | Approved by Governor | |
2011-03-22 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-03-21 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-03-14 | Concurred in Amend From Senate | |
2011-03-10 | Returned For Concurrence | |
2011-03-08 | Passed As Amended | |
2011-03-08 | Amended | |
2011-03-08 | Reconsidered | |
2011-03-03 | Motion to Reconsider Entered | |
2011-03-03 | Passed As Amended | |
2011-03-03 | Amended | |
2011-02-24 | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended | |
2011-02-21 | DR - TSDPAA: MU To CA | |
2011-02-02 | Referred To Municipalities;County Affairs | |
2011-02-01 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2011-01-31 | Passed | |
2011-01-26 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2011-01-26 | DR - TSDP: CA To MU | |
2011-01-25 | DR - TSDP: MU To CA | |
2011-01-04 | Referred To Municipalities;County Affairs |