MS HB189 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-17 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 35-1-43, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize The Mississippi State Veterans Affairs Board To Move The Mississippi Persian Gulf War Memorial From The Veterans Memorial Cemetery In Newton, Mississippi, To Another Appropriate Location; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mississippi Persian Gulf War Memorial; authorize MSVA to move to another appropriate location.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House Passed (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-17 Approved by Governor
2021-03-12SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2021-03-11HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2021-03-10SenateReturned For Enrolling
2021-03-09SenatePassed
2021-03-02SenateTitle Suff Do Pass
2021-02-17SenateReferred To Veterans and Military Affairs
2021-02-04HouseTransmitted To Senate
2021-02-03HousePassed
2021-01-26HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2021-01-08HouseReferred To Military Affairs

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
35143Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback