MS HB187 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 35-3-21, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise Certain Qualifications And Requirements For County Veteran Service Officers And To Require The Counties To Provide Necessary Office Space And Communications Connectivity; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

County veteran service officers; revise certain qualifications and requirements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-03 - House - House Passed (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-02SenateDied In Committee
2021-02-17SenateReferred To Veterans and Military Affairs
2021-02-04HouseTransmitted To Senate
2021-02-03HousePassed
2021-01-26HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2021-01-08HouseReferred To Military Affairs

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
35321Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback