MS HB186 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on March 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 75-24-15, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That Any Claim Or Action Under The Provisions Of The Consumer Protection Laws Filed On Behalf Of A Veteran For A Fee Must Include Certain Acknowledgments That The Mississippi State Veterans Affairs Board Offers The Same Service Free Of Charge; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Claims by veterans under consumer protection law; Mississippi Veterans Affairs Board offers service free of charge.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-03 - House - House Passed (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-02SenateDied In Committee
2021-02-17SenateReferred To Veterans and Military Affairs
2021-02-04HouseTransmitted To Senate
2021-02-03HousePassed
2021-01-26HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2021-01-08HouseReferred To Military Affairs

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
752415Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback