MS HB18 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 37-19-7, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Remove The Cap On The Number Of Licensed School Nurses Eligible For A Salary Supplement For National Board Certification; And For Related Purposes.
Title
National board certified school nurses; remove cap on number of eligible for annual salary supplement.
Sponsors
Rep. John Read [R] | Rep. Kevin Ford [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Died On Calendar |
2020-02-27 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-02-27 | House | DR - TSDP: AP To PH |
2020-02-20 | House | DR - TSDP: PH To AP |
2020-01-24 | House | Referred To Public Health and Human Services;Appropriations |
Mississippi State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2020/pdf/history/HB/HB0018.xml |
Text | https://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2020/html/HB/0001-0099/HB0018IN.htm |