MS HB1786 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on October 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Create The "technology Instruction And Digital Access To Learning (tidal) Act," Which Shall Be Administered By The State Department Of Education To Provide Structured Guidance, Technical And Financial Assistance To Local School Districts And Public Charter Schools In The Ability To Provide Distance Learning And Online Instruction; To Prescribe The Legislative Findings And Statement Of Intent; To Define Terminology; To Require The Department To Solicit Requests For Bid Proposals From Technology Vendors To Establish An Express Products List (epl), Or To Allow The Department To Use The Epls Compiled By The Mississippi Department Of Information Technology Services (mdits) For The Purchase Of Information Technology, Electronic Devices, Telecommunications Equipment And Software Programs; To Authorize The Department To Revise Epl Categories Based Upon Purchasing Demands, Which Are Consistent To Provide School Districts And Charter Schools With Structured Choice In The Selection Of The Brand And Type Of Electronic Devices Available For Purchase; To Permit School Districts And Charter Schools To Acquire Devices, Equipment And/or Software Outside Of The Epls And Structured Choice Recommendations Of The Department Upon The District's Demonstration That Such Devices, Equipment And/or Software Meet Or Exceed The Technological Specifications And Functionality Required By The Department And Can Be Purchased At An Optimal Price Point Less Than Offered On The Department's Epls; To Specify The Criteria To Be Considered By The Department In Establishing Its Epls And Structured Choice Guide In Order To Ensure Optimal Economical Pricing And Longevity Of Device Usage; To Require That The State Department Of Education Shall Have Procured All Necessary Wi-fi And Lte Enabled Devices, Program Components And Systems Of Product Supports And Services For The Delivery Of Digital Instruction Through Distance Learning By November 30, 2020; To Require Local School Districts And Charter Schools To Implement The Use Of Its Approved Digital Learning Program And Issue A Wi-fi Or Lte Enabled Electronic Device To Every Public School Student; To Require The Implemented Digital Learning Programs To Support Individualized Plans For School-to-home Connectivity To Provide Students With Access To The School District's Or Charter School's Learning Management System; To Require Each School Board To Identify A Digital Inclusion Coordinator For Each School Facility Under Its Governance, Who Shall Coordinate The Work And Report The Results Thereof To The District Superintendent To Be Submitted To The State Department Of Education For Purpose Of Inclusion In The State Superintendent Of Public Education Annual Legislative Report; To Require Every Public School Instructor And Administrator To Sign A Personal Professional Development Plan Acknowledgment That Includes Digital Inclusion, Virtual Learning And Training; To Allow The Use Of Technology-related Continuing Education Units (ceus) To Be Eligible To Satisfy The Professional Development Plan, Subject To Approval By The State Board Of Education; To Require Each Local School District And Charter School To Develop And Submit A Technology Sustainability Plan To The Department At The Time It Submits Its Request For Financial Assistance; To Stipulate That Each School District And Charter School Shall Assume The Control Of Ownership And Liability For Each Electronic Devices Purchased And Received For The Purpose Of Implementing Distance Learning Until Proper Disposal Of Such Devices; To Prescribe The Manners By Which A School District Or Charter School May Dispose Of Electronic Devices That Become Obsolete; To Provide School Districts And Charter Schools With The Authority To Develop Its Own Distance Learning Policy Governing The Modality Of Instruction And Deployment Of Services; To Require Such Plans To Align With The Guidelines Established By The Department To Ensure Continuity Of Service And Compliance With The College And Career Readiness Standards; To Require School Districts And Charter Schools To Compile And Maintain An Inventory Control List Of All Electronic Devices Purchased And Issued To Students, Teachers And Staff, As Well As Any Supporting Technology Devices Used In Delivery Of Online Instruction; To Require School Districts And Charter Schools To Conduct Annual Audits Of Equipment Upon The Conclusion Of The School Year; To Authorize School Districts And Charter Schools To Issue Fines To Students For Any Damage Caused To Or Destruction Of Electronic Devices, Outside Of Wear And Tear Caused By Normal Usage; To Require School Districts To Adopt And Implement A Cybersecurity Policy To Prevent, Protect From, Mitigate The Effects Of, Respond To And Recover From Cyber Threats; To Prescribe The Minimum Standards For Cybersecurity Policies; To Require Each School District And Charter School To Contribute An Equivalent Of 20% Of Its Total Elementary And Secondary School Emergency Relief (esser) Funds Allocation, Or An Equivalent Up To 20% Of Its Overall Covid-19 Related Digital Learning Technology Cost If The Total Costs Exceeds Its Esser Fund Allocation, Whichever Is Less, To Aid In The Cost Of Purchasing Electronic Devices, Technology Support Services And Software Programs To Be Eligible For Participation In The Grant Program; To Prescribe The Method By Which The Department Shall Allocate Grant Funds To School Districts And Charter Schools Using A Formula Developed By The Department; To Encourage School Districts And Charter Schools To Reserve And Commit A Portion Equivalent To 20% Of Its Esser Funds Allocation Or The Equivalent Of The Minimum Percentage Of Its Overall Covid-19 Related Digital Learning Technology Cost As Supplemental Matching Funds To Offset The Total Cost Of Procuring The Proper Electronic Devices And Technological Supports And Systems Of Service To Facilitate The Delivery Of The District's Or Charter School's Distance Learning Program; To Provide The State Department Of Education And Local School Districts Or Charter Schools Acting As Their Own Procurement Agent With Immunity From Civil Liability For Any Damages Arising From The Public Procurement Of Personnel, Property, Supplies Or Services Necessary To Administer The Provisions Of This Act; To Amend Section 37-67-1, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Establishes The Distance Learning Collaborative, To Include Charter Schools; To Amend Section 31-7-13, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Exempt State Governmental Agencies, Local Governing Authorities And Any Political Subdivision Thereof, Including Local School Districts, Charter Schools And Public Special Purpose Schools, From The Procurement And Competitive Bidding Requirements For Purchases Of Equipment, Technological Devices, Hardware And Software For Such Devices, Supplies And Services Directly Associated With The Mitigation Of The Impact Of Covid-19 For Purposes Of Providing Continual Education, Health Care, Social Service And Utility Needs; To Amend Section 37-7-459, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide Charter Schools With The Authority To Sell Computer Devices To Students Of Issue Upon Graduating High School, With Pricing Conditions; To Provide That The Provisions Of This Act Are Severable; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

"Technology Instruction and Digital Access to Learning (TIDAL) Act"; create to establish digital learning programs for K-12 education and provide grants for electronic devices used in instruction.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-25 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 114 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-02SenateDied In Committee
2020-06-29SenateReferred To Education
2020-06-27HouseTransmitted To Senate
2020-06-25HousePassed As Amended
2020-06-25HouseAmended
2020-06-25HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2020-06-24HouseReferred To Rules
2020-06-24 Suspend from Deadlines by HC 69

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback