MS HB1782 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Vetoed on July 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-08 - Partially Vetoed By Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act Making An Appropriation From The Budget Contingency Fund To The Mississippi Development Authority, The State Department Of Health, The State Department Of Mental Health And The Board Of Trustees Of State Institutions Of Higher Learning For The Purposes Of Addressing Or Related To The Public Health Emergency Due To The Covid-19 Pandemic; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriation; several agencies for addressing the public health emergency due to the Covid-19 pandemic.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-07-01 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-01 - House - House Concurred in Amend From Senate (Y: 112 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - House - House Passed (Y: 108 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-08 Partially Vetoed By Governor
2020-07-02HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2020-07-02SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2020-07-01HouseImmediate Release
2020-07-01HouseConcurred in Amend From Senate
2020-07-01SenateReturned For Concurrence
2020-07-01SenateImmediate Release
2020-07-01SenatePassed As Amended
2020-07-01SenateAmended
2020-07-01SenateTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2020-06-29SenateReferred To Appropriations
2020-06-27HouseTransmitted To Senate
2020-06-25HousePassed
2020-06-25HouseCommittee Substitute Adopted
2020-06-25HouseTitle Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2020-06-23HouseReferred To Rules
2020-06-23 Suspend from Deadlines by HC 69

Mississippi State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2020/pdf/history/HB/HB1782.xml
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2020/html/HB/1700-1799/HB1782IN.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2020/html/HB/1700-1799/HB1782CS.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2020/html/HB/1700-1799/HB1782PS.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2020/html/HB/1700-1799/HB1782SG.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2020/html/sam/HB1782_S_Cmte_Amend_01.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2020/html/sam/HB1782_S_Subst_1_for_Cmte_Amend_01.htm
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2020/pdf/votes/house/1710007.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2020/pdf/votes/house/1770013.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2020/pdf/votes/senate/1770033.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback