MS HB1778 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on July 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-07 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on July 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-07 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Chapter 916, Local And Private Laws Of 2016, To Extend The Date Of Repeal From July 1, 2016, To July 1, 2024, On The Provision Of Law That Authorizes The Boards Of Supervisors Of Alcorn, Benton, Prentiss, Tippah And Tishomingo Counties To Contribute To Northeast Mississippi Community Services, Inc., In An Amount Determined By Each Individual Board Not To Exceed $150,000.00 To Be Used As Matching Funds From The State Or Federal Government; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Alcorn, Benton, Prentiss, Tippah, Tishomingo Counties; extend repealer on authority to contribute to Northeast Mississippi Community Services.
Sponsors
Rep. Nick Bain [R] | Rep. William Arnold [R] | Rep. Lester Carpenter [R] | Rep. John Faulkner [D] |
Rep. Bill Kinkade [R] | Rep. Steve Massengill [R] | Rep. Jody Steverson [R] | Rep. Jerry Turner [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - House - House Passed (Y: 116 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - House - House Passed (Y: 116 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-07 | Approved by Governor | |
2020-06-30 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-30 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Passed |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Referred To Local and Private |
2020-06-19 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2020-06-18 | House | Passed |
2020-06-18 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2020-06-17 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2020-06-16 | House | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |