MS HB1758 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-21 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Provide For A Fee For Filing Petitions To Expunge Certain Felony Convictions; To Provide That The Funds Derived From The Fee Shall Be Deposited Into The Special Funds Created In The State Treasury In This Act; To Create A Special Fund In The State Treasury Which Shall Be Administered By The Administrative Office Of Courts For The Purpose Of Providing Funds For The Operation Of The Judicial System In The State; To Create A Special Fund In The State Treasury And Provide That Monies In The Special Fund Shall Be Used For The Purpose Of Providing Funds For The Operation Of The Offices Of District Attorneys In The State; To Bring Forward Section 9-1-36, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Provides Certain Funds For Defraying Office Operating Expenses Of Circuit Judges And Chancellors, For The Purposes Of Amendment; To Bring Forward Section 25-31-8, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Provides Certain Funds For Defraying Office Operating Expenses Of District Attorneys, For The Purposes Of Amendment; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expunction of certain criminal offenses; provide for filing fee.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-04-23 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-22 - House - House Passed (Y: 115 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-05-21 Approved by Governor
2010-05-04 Enrolled Bill Signed
2010-04-29 Enrolled Bill Signed
2010-04-23 Transmitted To House
2010-04-23 Passed
2010-04-23 Title Suff Do Pass
2010-04-23 Referred To Judiciary, Division B
2010-04-22 Transmitted To Senate
2010-04-22 Immediate Release
2010-04-22 Passed
2010-04-22 Title Suff Do Pass
2010-04-22 Referred To Judiciary A
2010-04-22 Suspend from Deadlines by HC 133

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback