MS HB1743 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Authorize The Board Of Supervisors Of Lafayette County, Mississippi, To Create And Establish A Public Body Corporate And Politic Constituting A Political Subdivision Of The State Of Mississippi To Be Known As The Lafayette County Utility Authority For The Purpose Of Providing Storm Water, Water And Wastewater Systems For The Anticipated Growth Within Lafayette County And Economic Development Activities Within Lafayette County; To Provide For A Board Of Directors To Exercise The Powers Of The Authority; To Provide For The Membership Of The Board Of Directors; To Provide For The Powers, Duties And Responsibilities Of The Authority; To Authorize Public Agencies To Enter Into Contracts With The Authority For Certain Purposes; To Provide That Any Municipality, Public Agency, District, Public Utility Or Other Person Authorized By Law To Provide Water, Sewer And Wastewater Services To Transfer Its Powers, Duties And Responsibilities To The Authority; To Authorize The Authority To Borrow Money And To Issue Revenue Bonds And Interim Notes In Such Principal Amounts As The Authority May Determine To Be Necessary To Provide Sufficient Funds For Achieving One Or More Of The Purposes Of This Act; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Lafayette County; authorize to create the Lafayette County Utility Authority.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-21 - House - House Passed (Y: 105 N: 6 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29SenateDied In Committee
2019-03-29SenateReferred To Local and Private;Finance
2019-03-25HouseTransmitted To Senate
2019-03-21HousePassed
2019-03-21HouseCommittee Substitute Adopted
2019-03-20HouseTitle Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2019-03-14HouseReferred To Local and Private Legislation

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback