MS HB1741 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-21 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Authorize The Board Of Supervisors Of Attala County, Mississippi, To Construct A New County Jail Anywhere Within The County; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Attala County; authorize to construct jail anywhere in the county.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-04-23 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - House - House Passed (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-05-21 Approved by Governor
2010-05-04 Enrolled Bill Signed
2010-04-29 Enrolled Bill Signed
2010-04-23 Transmitted To House
2010-04-23 Immediate Release
2010-04-23 Passed
2010-04-22 Title Suff Do Pass
2010-04-22 Referred To Local and Private
2010-04-22 Transmitted To Senate
2010-04-22 Immediate Release
2010-04-21 Passed
2010-04-20 Title Suff Do Pass
2010-03-19 Referred To Local and Private Legislation

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback