MS HB1734 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-14 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-14 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Issuance Of State General Obligation Bonds For The Purpose Of Repairs And Renovations For State Institutions Of Higher Learning; To Authorize The Issuance Of State General Obligation Bonds For The Purpose Of Repairs And Renovations For Community And Junior Colleges; To Authorize The Issuance Of State General Obligation Bonds To Provide Funds For Capital Improvements At The State-owned Shipyard Located In Jackson County, Mississippi; To Provide That The Issuance Of Such Bonds Shall Be Conditioned On The Lessee Incurring A Certain Amount Of Debt And/or Dedicating A Certain Amount Of Funds For Capital Improvements, Capital Investments Or Capital Upgrades To Shipyards In Mississippi Owned Or Leased By Such Lessee; To Authorize The Issuance Of State General Obligation Bonds To Provide Funds For The Construction, Furnishing And Equipping Of A New Highway Safety Patrol Substation In Starkville, Mississippi; To Authorize The Issuance Of State General Obligation Bonds To Provide Funds To The Mississippi Department Of Wildlife, Fisheries And Parks To Assist In Paying Costs Associated With Repair And Renovation Of Capital Facilities, Improvements, Dams, Roofing, Wastewater And Water Well Mandates, And Other Facility Maintenance Items And Purposes; To Authorize The Issuance Of State General Obligation Bonds To Provide Funds For The Mississippi Watershed Repair And Rehabilitation Cost-share Program; To Amend Section 51-37-3, Mississippi Code Of 1972, In Conformity Thereto; To Authorize The Issuance Of State General Obligation Bonds For The Purpose Of Providing Funds For The Mississippi Community Heritage Preservation Grant Fund; To Amend Section 39-5-145, Mississippi Code Of 1972, In Conformity Thereto; To Authorize The Issuance Of State General Obligation Bonds To Provide Funds For Construction, Repair, Renovation And Replacement Of Buildings At The Alcoholic Beverage Control Warehouse Located In Madison County, Mississippi, And For The Purchase Or Renovation Of Equipment At Such Warehouse; To Authorize The Issuance Of State General Obligation Bonds To Provide Matching Funds For Federal Funds For The Water Pollution Control Revolving Fund; To Amend Section 49-17-85, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize Interest And Investment Earnings On Money In The Water Pollution Control Revolving Fund To Be Utilized To Pay Debt Service On The Bonds Authorized To Be Issued By This Act; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Bonds; authorize for various purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeffrey Smith [R] | Rep. Deborah Butler Dixon [D] | Rep. Gregory Holloway [D] | Rep. Robert Huddleston [D] |
Rep. Kathy Sykes [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-21 - House - House Passed (Y: 103 N: 14 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-14 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Referred To Finance |
2017-02-23 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2017-02-23 | House | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2017-02-21 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Staples, Smith, Lamar) |
2017-02-21 | House | Passed |
2017-02-21 | House | Amendment Failed |
2017-02-21 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2017-02-21 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2017-02-21 | House | Referred To Ways and Means |