MS HB1732 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Governing Authorities Of The Town Of Seminary, Mississippi, To Allow The Operation Of Golf Carts On Certain Public Roads And Streets Within The Town; To Require Individuals Operating A Golf Cart To Have A Valid Driver's License Or Temporary Driver's Permit; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Town of Seminary; authorize use of golf carts on certain public roads and streets within the town.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - House Passed (Y: 114 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - House Passed (Y: 114 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | Approved by Governor | |
2019-03-27 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Passed |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Referred To Local and Private |
2019-03-20 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2019-03-20 | House | Immediate Release |
2019-03-20 | House | Passed |
2019-03-19 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2019-03-13 | House | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |