MS HB173 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-18 - Allow Governor's Veto to Stand
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 83-34-39, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Extend The Date Of The Repealer On The Requirement That A Portion Of The State Insurance Premium Tax Revenue Be Deposited Into The Mississippi Windstorm Underwriting Association Reinsurance Assistance Fund; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MS Windstorm Underwriting Assoc. Reinsur. Assistance Fund; extend repealer on req. that certain tax revenues be deposited into.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-03-03 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-04 - House - House Passed (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-03-18 Allow Governor's Veto to Stand
2010-03-16 Veto Referred To Insurance
2010-03-15 Vetoed
2010-03-09 Enrolled Bill Signed
2010-03-09 Enrolled Bill Signed
2010-03-04 Transmitted To House
2010-03-03 Passed
2010-02-25 Title Suff Do Pass
2010-02-08 Referred To Insurance
2010-02-05 Transmitted To Senate
2010-02-04 Passed
2010-01-27 Title Suff Do Pass
2010-01-05 Referred To Insurance

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback