MS HB1720 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-14 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-14 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act Making An Appropriation To The University Of Mississippi Medical Center To Assist In Paying The Costs Associated With Repair And Renovation At And Acquisition Of Equipment For The Facility Used For The Adolescent Psychiatric Program, For The Fiscal Year 2024.
Title
Appropriation; UMMC for repair and renovation of the adolescent psychiatric program facility.
Sponsors
Rep. John Read [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-21 - House - House Passed (Y: 113 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-14 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Referred To Appropriations |
2023-02-22 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2023-02-21 | House | Passed |
2023-02-20 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2023-02-20 | House | Referred To Appropriations |