MS HB1715 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 14 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-14 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 14 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-14 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act Making An Additional Appropriation To The State Department Of Health For The Purpose Of Funding The Arpa Rural Water Associations Infrastructure Grant Program For The Period Beginning Upon The Passage Of This Act And Ending June 30, 2024.
Title
Appropriation; Health Department for funding the ARPA Rural Water Associations Infrastructure Grant Program.
Sponsors
Rep. John Read [R] | Rep. De Stamps [D] | Rep. Randy Boyd [R] | Rep. Scott Bounds [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-30 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 117 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - House Passed (Y: 114 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - House Passed (Y: 114 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-14 | Approved by Governor | |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2023-04-03 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2023-03-30 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2023-03-29 | Suspend from Deadlines by HC 61 | |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2023-03-27 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2023-03-26 | Senate | Recommitted For Further Conf |
2023-03-26 | House | Recommitted For Further Conf |
2023-03-25 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2023-03-25 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2023-03-17 | Senate | Conferees Named Hopson,Polk,Hill |
2023-03-15 | House | Conferees Named Read,Oliver,Mims |
2023-03-14 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Amended |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Referred To Appropriations |
2023-02-22 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2023-02-21 | House | Passed |
2023-02-20 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2023-02-20 | House | Referred To Appropriations |