MS HB1713 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Restore The Right Of Suffrage To Dexter L. Foster Of Harrison County, Mississippi.
Title
Suffrage; restore to Dexter Lee Foster of Lee County.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-22 - House - House Passed (Y: 108 N: 2 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division B |
2019-03-22 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2019-03-22 | House | Immediate Release |
2019-03-22 | House | Passed |
2019-03-21 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2019-03-05 | House | Referred To Judiciary B |