MS HB1712 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-08 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-08 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act Making An Appropriation For The Purpose Of Defraying The Expenses Of The State Department Of Health For The Fiscal Year 2021.
Title
Appropriation; Health, Department of.
Sponsors
Rep. John Read [R] | Rep. Sam Mims [R] | Rep. William Arnold [R] | Rep. Scott Bounds [R] |
Rep. Bryant Clark [D] | Rep. Alyce Clarke [D] | Rep. Dana Criswell [R] | Rep. Becky Currie [R] |
Rep. Dan Eubanks [R] | Rep. John Hines [D] | Rep. Joey Hood [R] | Rep. Noah Sanford [R] |
Rep. Percy Watson [D] | Rep. Charles Young [D] | Rep. Stephanie Foster [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-29 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 114 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-12 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - House - House Passed (Y: 115 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-12 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - House - House Passed (Y: 115 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-08 | Approved by Governor | |
2020-07-02 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-07-01 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-29 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2020-06-28 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2020-06-28 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Conferees Named Hopson,Hill,Moran |
2020-06-22 | House | Conferees Named Read,Mims,Bounds |
2020-06-17 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2020-06-12 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2020-06-12 | Senate | Amended |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Referred To Appropriations |
2020-05-27 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2020-05-27 | House | Immediate Release |
2020-05-27 | House | Passed |
2020-05-27 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-05-26 | House | Referred To Appropriations |