MS HB1702 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-21 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-21 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Governing Authorities Of The City Of Fulton, Mississippi, To Levy A Tax Upon The Gross Proceeds Of Hotels And Motels Derived From Room Rentals; To Provide That The Revenue From The Tax Shall Be Expended By The City Of Fulton To Promote Tourism And Parks And Recreation; To Provide That The Tax Shall Be Collected By The Department Of Revenue And Paid To The City Of Fulton; To Provide For A Referendum On Whether The Tax May Be Levied; And For Related Purposes.
Title
City of Fulton; authorize a tax on hotels and motels.
Sponsors
Rep. Donnie Bell [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-28 - House - House Concurred in Amend From Senate (Y: 109 N: 2 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-23 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-24 - House - House Passed (Y: 105 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-23 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-24 - House - House Passed (Y: 105 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-21 | Approved by Governor | |
2010-05-04 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-04-29 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-04-28 | Concurred in Amend From Senate | |
2010-04-23 | Returned For Concurrence | |
2010-04-23 | Immediate Release | |
2010-04-23 | Passed As Amended | |
2010-04-23 | Amended | |
2010-04-23 | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended | |
2010-04-23 | DR - TSDPAA: FI To LP | |
2010-03-26 | DR - TSDP: LP To FI | |
2010-03-25 | Referred To Local and Private;Finance | |
2010-03-25 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2010-03-24 | Passed | |
2010-03-24 | Committee Substitute Adopted | |
2010-03-24 | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub | |
2010-02-22 | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |