MS HB1700 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on July 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-08 - Partially Vetoed By Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act Making An Appropriation For The Purpose Of Funding K-12 And Other Related Educational Activities, Including Certain Agencies And Programs, In The State Of Mississippi, For The Fiscal Year 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriation; Education, Department of.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-30 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-30 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 110 N: 2 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 107 N: 4 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-12 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - House - House Passed (Y: 115 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-08 Partially Vetoed By Governor
2020-07-02HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2020-07-02SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2020-06-30SenateConference Report Adopted
2020-06-30HouseConference Report Adopted
2020-06-30SenateConference Report Filed
2020-06-30HouseConference Report Filed
2020-06-30HouseRecommitted For Further Conf
2020-06-30HouseReconsidered
2020-06-29SenateRecommitted For Further Conf
2020-06-29SenateMotion to Reconsider Entered
2020-06-29HouseConference Report Adopted
2020-06-29SenateConference Report Adopted
2020-06-28HouseConference Report Filed
2020-06-28SenateConference Report Filed
2020-06-22SenateConferees Named Hopson,DeBar,Blackwell
2020-06-22HouseConferees Named Read,Bennett,Ladner
2020-06-17HouseDecline to Concur/Invite Conf
2020-06-15SenateReturned For Concurrence
2020-06-12SenatePassed As Amended
2020-06-12SenateAmended
2020-06-11SenateTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2020-06-03SenateReferred To Appropriations
2020-05-27HouseTransmitted To Senate
2020-05-27HouseImmediate Release
2020-05-27HousePassed
2020-05-27HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2020-05-26HouseReferred To Appropriations

Mississippi State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2020/pdf/history/HB/HB1700.xml
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2020/html/HB/1700-1799/HB1700IN.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2020/html/HB/1700-1799/HB1700PS.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2020/html/HB/1700-1799/HB1700SG.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2020/html/sam/HB1700_S_Cmte_Amend_01.htm
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2020/pdf/votes/house/1420005.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2020/pdf/votes/senate/1580051.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2020/pdf/votes/senate/1750003.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2020/pdf/votes/house/1750002.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2020/pdf/votes/house/1760019.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2020/pdf/votes/senate/1760023.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback