MS HB1700 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-20 - Law W/out Governor's Signature
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Restore The Right Of Suffrage To Valeska Summerville Of Lowndes County, Mississippi.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Suffrage; restore to Valeska Summerville of Lowndes County.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 48 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-25 - House - House Passed (Y: 103 N: 5 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-20 Law W/out Governor's Signature
2018-04-02SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2018-04-02HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2018-03-28SenateReturned For Enrolling
2018-03-27SenatePassed
2018-03-25SenateTitle Suff Do Pass
2018-03-25SenateReferred To Judiciary, Division B
2018-03-25HouseTransmitted To Senate
2018-03-25HouseImmediate Release
2018-03-25HousePassed
2018-03-24HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2018-03-20HouseReferred To Judiciary B

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback