MS HB1699 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Provide For The Method Of Apportionment Of Income For Income Tax Purposes Of A Major Medical Laboratory Service Business; To Amend Section 27-7-23, Mississippi Code Of 1972, In Conformity Thereto; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Income tax; provide for method of apportioning income of certain medical laboratory service businesses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House Passed (Y: 113 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House Passed (Y: 113 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-19 | Approved by Governor | |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-12 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Passed |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Referred To Finance |
2019-02-27 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2019-02-26 | House | Passed |
2019-02-26 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2019-02-25 | House | Referred To Ways and Means |