MS HB1690 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-03 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-03 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Board Of Supervisors Of Sunflower County, Mississippi, To Contribute Funds To The Fannie Lou Hamer Cancer Foundation; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Sunflower County; authorize contribution to Fannie Lou Hamer Cancer Foundation.
Sponsors
Rep. Sara Thomas [D] | Rep. Christopher Bell [D] | Rep. Alyce Clarke [D] | Rep. Gregory Holloway [D] |
Rep. Robert Huddleston [D] | Rep. Kabir Karriem [D] | Rep. Adrienne Wooten [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-19 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - House - House Passed (Y: 105 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - House - House Passed (Y: 105 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-03 | Approved by Governor | |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-04-21 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Passed |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Referred To Local and Private |
2016-04-08 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2016-04-06 | House | Passed |
2016-04-06 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2016-03-16 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2016-03-08 | House | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |