MS HB1690 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 3 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-04 - Due From Governor 05/22/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on May 3 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-04 - Due From Governor 05/22/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Chapter 936, Local And Private Laws Of 2010, To Extend The Date Of Repeal From December 31, 2012, To January 31, 2013, On The Harrison County Motor Vehicle For Hire Commission; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Harrison County Motor Vehicle for Hire Commission; extend repealer on.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-02 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-01 - House - House Passed (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-01 - House - House Passed (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-04 | Due From Governor 05/22/12 | |
2012-05-03 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2012-05-03 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2012-05-02 | Transmitted To House | |
2012-05-02 | Immediate Release | |
2012-05-02 | Passed | |
2012-05-02 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2012-05-02 | Referred To Local and Private | |
2012-05-02 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2012-05-01 | Immediate Release | |
2012-05-01 | Passed | |
2012-05-01 | Committee Substitute Adopted | |
2012-04-30 | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub | |
2012-04-25 | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |