MS HB1687 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-13 - Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on April 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-13 - Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Restore The Right Of Suffrage To Patrick Joseph Fick Of Harrison County, Mississippi.
Title
Suffrage; restore to Patrick Joseph Fick.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 48 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-25 - House - House Passed (Y: 107 N: 2 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-25 - House - House Passed (Y: 107 N: 2 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-13 | Vetoed | |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-04-02 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Passed |
2018-03-25 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2018-03-25 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division B |
2018-03-25 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2018-03-25 | House | Immediate Release |
2018-03-25 | House | Passed |
2018-03-24 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2018-03-15 | House | Rereferred To Judiciary B |
2018-03-13 | House | Referred To Rules |