MS HB1677 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-14 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-14 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Governing Authorities Of The City Of Hattiesburg To Contribute Funds Through Calendar Year 2017 To The Hattiesburg Downtown Association, Incorporated, For The Purpose Of Revitalizing Downtown Hattiesburg; And For Related Purposes.
Title
City of Hattiesburg; authorize annual contributions to Hattiesburg Downtown Association, Inc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-27 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - House - House Passed (Y: 113 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - House - House Passed (Y: 113 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-14 | Approved by Governor | |
2015-03-31 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Passed |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Referred To Local and Private |
2015-03-26 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2015-03-25 | House | Immediate Release |
2015-03-25 | House | Passed |
2015-03-25 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2015-03-24 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2015-03-13 | House | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |