MS HB1674 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Authorize The Issuance Of State General Obligation Bonds For The Purpose Of Making Capital Improvements For State Institutions Of Higher Learning, State Agencies And Community And Junior Colleges; To Authorize The Issuance Of State General Obligation Bonds To Provide Funds For The Mississippi Community Heritage Preservation Grant Fund; To Amend Section 39-5-145, Mississippi Code Of 1972, In Conformity Thereto; To Increase The Amount Of Funds That May Be Disbursed As Grant Funds To The City Of Columbus, Mississippi, To Assist In Paying The Costs Associated With Repair, Renovation And Restoration Of The Columbus City Hall Building And Related Facilities; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Bonds; authorize issuance for various purposes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House Passed (Y: 109 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29HouseDied In Conference
2019-03-22SenateConferees Named Fillingane,Kirby,Chassaniol
2019-03-22HouseConferees Named Smith,Lamar,White
2019-03-21HouseDecline to Concur/Invite Conf
2019-03-20SenateReturned For Concurrence
2019-03-19SenatePassed As Amended
2019-03-19SenateAmended
2019-03-18SenateTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2019-02-28SenateReferred To Finance
2019-02-27HouseTransmitted To Senate
2019-02-26HousePassed
2019-02-20HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2019-02-18HouseReferred To Ways and Means

Mississippi State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2019/pdf/history/HB/HB1674.xml
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/HB/1600-1699/HB1674IN.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/HB/1600-1699/HB1674PS.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/sam/HB1674_S_Cmte_Amend_01.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/sam/HB1674_S_Amend_01_to_Cmte_Amend_01.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/sam/HB1674_S_Amend_02_to_Cmte_Amend_01.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/sam/HB1674_S_Amend_03_to_Cmte_Amend_01.htm
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2019/pdf/votes/house/0500011.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2019/pdf/votes/senate/0710015.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback