MS HB1674 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Chapter 932, Local And Private Laws Of 2015, To Extend The Date Of Repeal From July 1, 2018, To July 1, 2022, On The Provisions Of Law That Authorizes The Board Of Supervisors Of Jackson County, Mississippi, To Levy A Tax Upon Hotel And Motel Room Rentals In The County And Provides That The Revenue From Such Levy Shall Be Used For The Promotion Of Tourism On The Mississippi Gulf Coast By The Mississippi Gulf Coast Regional Convention And Visitors Bureau; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Jackson County; extend repealer on hotel/motel tax levy that has revenue paid to MS Gulf Coast Regional Convention and Visitors Bureau to promote tourism.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Died In Committee |
2018-03-06 | House | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |
Mississippi State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2018/pdf/history/HB/HB1674.xml |
Text | https://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2018/html/HB/1600-1699/HB1674IN.htm |