MS HB1669 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Issuance Of State General Obligation Bonds To Provide Funds To Assist Scenic Rivers Development Alliance In Paying Costs Associated With Repair, Renovation And Rehabilitation Of And Upgrades And Improvements To Various Parks, Lakes And Facilities And Property In Amite County, Franklin County, Pike County, Walthall County And Wilkinson County; To Authorize The Issuance Of State General Obligation Bonds To Provide Funds To Assist Scenic Rivers Development Alliance In Paying Costs Associated With The Acquisition Of Approximately One Hundred Fifty Acres Of Land From The United States Department Of Agriculture In Franklin County, Mississippi, Construction And Development Of A Conference Center And Related Buildings And Facilities On Such Land And Related Infrastructure Improvements; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Bonds; authorize issuance to assist Scenic Rivers Development Alliance with certain projects.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeffrey Smith [R] | Rep. Sam Mims [R] | Rep. Jeffery Harness [D] | Rep. Robert Johnson [D] |
Rep. Vince Mangold [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-26 - House - House Passed (Y: 104 N: 8 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-19 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Referred To Finance |
2019-02-27 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2019-02-26 | House | Passed |
2019-02-20 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2019-02-18 | House | Referred To Ways and Means |