MS HB1667 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act Making An Additional Appropriation Of Capital Expense Funds, And Special Funds To Defray The Expenses Of The Department Of Child Protection Services For Fiscal Year 2019; The Department Of Finance And Administration For Fiscal Year 2019; The Wireless Communication Commission For Fiscal Year 2019; The Department Of Public Safety For Fiscal Year 2019 And Fiscal Year 2020; Mississippi Department Of Marine Resources For Fiscal Year 2019; The Attorney General's Office For Fiscal Year 2019 And Fiscal Year 2020; Mississippi Emergency Management Agency ? Disaster Trust For Fiscal Year 2019 And Fiscal Year 2020; Mississippi Department Of Corrections For Fiscal Year 2019; Department Of Audit For Fiscal Year 2019; Department Of Revenue For Fiscal Year 2019; Board Of Animal Health For Fiscal Year 2019; Board Of Medical Licensure For Fiscal Year 2019; Institutions Of Higher Learning ? Office Of Student Financial Aid For Fiscal Year 2019 And Fiscal Year 2020; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Appropriation; additional for various state agencies for Fiscal Year 2019.
Sponsors
Rep. John Read [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 106 N: 8 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 40 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House Passed (Y: 108 N: 4 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 106 N: 8 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 40 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House Passed (Y: 108 N: 4 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | Approved by Governor | |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-04-02 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2019-03-27 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2019-03-26 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Conferees Named Clarke,Hopson,Tollison |
2019-03-19 | House | Conferees Named Read,Cockerham,Huddleston |
2019-03-19 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Amended |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Referred To Appropriations |
2019-02-20 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2019-02-19 | House | Passed |
2019-02-19 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2019-02-18 | House | Referred To Appropriations |