MS HB1667 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Governing Authorities Of The City Of Pearl, Mississippi, To Levy A Tax Of Not More Than 3% Upon The Gross Proceeds Of Sales Of Hotels And Motels Derived From Room Rentals And To Impose An Additional Tax Of Not More Than 1% Upon The Gross Proceeds Of Sales Of Restaurants For The Purpose Of Providing Funds To Promote Tourism, Parks And Recreation In The City; To Provide For An Election Be Held On The Question Of Whether Such Taxes May Be Levied; And For Related Purposes.
Title
City of Pearl; authorize a tax on restaurants, hotels and motels to promote tourism, parks and recreation.
Sponsors
Rep. Ray Rogers [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-23 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House Passed (Y: 89 N: 13 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House Passed (Y: 89 N: 13 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-12 | Approved by Governor | |
2018-03-24 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-03-24 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Passed |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Referred To Local and Private |
2018-03-16 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2018-03-14 | House | Passed |
2018-03-14 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2018-03-07 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2018-03-06 | House | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |