MS HB1663 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-05 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-05 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Issuance Of State General Obligation Bonds For The Purpose Of Making Capital Improvements For State Institutions Of Higher Learning And Community And Junior Colleges; To Amend Section 1, Chapter 480, Laws Of 2021, To Revise The Purposes For Which The Proceeds Of Bonds Authorized To Be Issued For Mississippi State University May Be Used; To Amend Sections 6 Through 20, Chapter 521, Laws Of 1995, As Last Amended By Section 25, Chapter 492, Laws Of 2019, To Increase From $36,843,000 To $41,293,000 The Amount Of State General Obligation Bonds Authorized To Be Issued For The Local Governments And Rural Water Systems Improvements Revolving Loan Fund; An Act To Authorize The Issuance Of State General Obligation Bonds To Provide Funds For The Mississippi Community Heritage Preservation Grant Fund; To Amend Section 39-5-145, Mississippi Code Of 1972, In Conformity Thereto; To Authorize The Issuance Of State General Obligation Bonds In The Amount Of $4,490,000 To Provide Matching Funds For Federal Funds For The Water Pollution Control Revolving Fund; To Provide That Not More Than $2,870,000 Of Such Bonds May Be Issued To Match The Annual Clean Water State Revolving Fund Appropriations And That Not More Than $1,620,000 Of Such Bonds May Be Issued To Match The Supplemental Infrastructure And Investment Jobs Act Appropriations; To Amend Section 49-17-85, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize Interest And Investment Earnings On Money In The Water Pollution Control Revolving Fund To Be Utilized To Pay Debt Service On The Bonds Authorized To Be Issued By This Act; To Amend Section 18, Chapter 492, Laws Of 2020, To Increase The Amount Of State General Obligation Bonds That May Be Issued To Provide Funds For The "mississippi Dam Safety Fund"; To Authorize The Issuance Of State General Obligation Bonds To Provide Funds To Assist Tate County, Mississippi, In Paying Costs Associated With Ditch Erosion Control, Repair And Rehabilitation In Tate County; To Authorize The Issuance Of State General Obligation Bonds To Provide Funds For The Building Fund For The Arts; To Amend Section 39-11-13, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Purposes For Which Monies In The Building Fund For The Arts May Be Used; To Authorize The Issuance Of State General Obligation Bonds In The Amount Of $50,000,000 For The Ace Fund; To Authorize The Issuance Of State General Obligation Bonds In The Amount Of $10,000,000 To Provide Funds For The Mississippi Site Development Grant Fund; To Amend Section 57-1-701, Mississippi Code Of 1972, In Conformity Thereto, And To Expand The Categories Of Eligible Expenditures From The Mississippi Site Development Grant Fund; To Amend Section 57-61-25, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Increase By $10,000,000 The Amount Of General Obligation Bonds That May Be Issued Under The Mississippi Business Investment Act; To Amend Section 57-61-36, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Increase The Amount Of Bond Proceeds That The Mississippi Development Authority May Utilize Under The Mississippi Business Investment Act To Make Grants Or Loans To Municipalities Through An Equipment And Public Facilities Grant And Loan Fund To Aid In Infrastructure-related Improvements, The Purchase Of Equipment, And The Purchase, Construction Or Repair And Renovation Of Public Facilities; To Amend Section 57-75-15, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Increase From $80,000,000 To $83,000,000 The Amount Of General Obligation Bonds That May Be Issued Under The Mississippi Major Economic Impact Act For Projects Designed To Enhance Facilities That Are At Risk For Closure Pursuant To The Defense Base Realignment And Closure Act Of 1990 Or Other Applicable Federal Law; To Extend The Repealer On The Provisions That Authorize The State Bond Commission To Negotiate The Sale Of Bonds Issued Under The Mississippi Major Economic Impact Act; To Amend Section 65-4-25, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Increase By $7,000,000 The Amount Of Bonds Authorized To Be Issued Under The Economic Development Highway Act; To Amend Section 25, Chapter 533, Laws Of 2010, As Last Amended By Section 14, Chapter 480, Laws Of 2021, To Increase By $10,000,000 The Amount Of General Obligation Bonds That May Be Issued For The Mississippi Industry Incentive Financing Revolving Fund; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Bonds; authorize issuance for various purposes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-04 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 114 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 49 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 114 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 114 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 49 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 114 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-05 | House | Died In Conference |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Recommitted For Further Conf |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Reconsidered |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Entered |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2022-03-28 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2022-03-27 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2022-03-27 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2022-03-27 | House | Recommitted For Further Conf |
2022-03-27 | Senate | Recommitted For Further Conf |
2022-03-26 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2022-03-26 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Conferees Named Harkins,Johnson,Parker |
2022-03-22 | House | Conferees Named Lamar,Steverson,Massengill |
2022-03-17 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Amended |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Referred To Finance |
2022-02-18 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2022-02-17 | House | Passed As Amended |
2022-02-17 | House | Amended |
2022-02-16 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2022-02-16 | House | Referred To Ways and Means |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
39 | 11 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 5 | 145 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
49 | 17 | 85 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
57 | 1 | 701 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
57 | 61 | 25 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
57 | 61 | 36 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
57 | 75 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
65 | 4 | 25 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |