MS HB1663 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Board Of Supervisors Of Oktibbeha County, Mississippi, To Contribute Funds To The Institute Of Community Services, Inc. (ics), Also Known As Head Start, For The Purpose Of Assisting In The Purchase Of A School Bus For The Use And Benefit Of Ics; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Oktibbeha County; authorize contribution to Institute of Community Services, Inc., for purchase of school bus.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House Passed (Y: 112 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House Passed (Y: 112 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | Approved by Governor | |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-03-23 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Passed |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Referred To Local and Private |
2018-03-16 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2018-03-14 | House | Passed |
2018-03-14 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2018-02-28 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2018-02-27 | House | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |