MS HB1653 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Governing Authorities Of The City Of Clinton, Mississippi, To Allow The Operation Of Golf Carts On Certain Public Roads And Streets Within Certain Subdivided Residential Neighborhoods In The City; And For Related Purposes.
Title
City of Clinton; authorize use of golf carts on certain public roads and streets.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-24 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House Passed (Y: 112 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House Passed (Y: 112 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-11 | Approved by Governor | |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-03-25 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-03-24 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2018-03-24 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2018-03-24 | Senate | Passed |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Referred To Local and Private |
2018-03-14 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2018-03-13 | House | Passed |
2018-02-21 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2018-02-20 | House | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |