MS HB1651 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act Making An Appropriation To The Department Of Rehabilitation Services For Fiscal Year 2020.
Title
Appropriation; Rehabilitation Services, Department of.
Sponsors
Rep. John Read [R] | Rep. Sam Mims [R] | Rep. William Arnold [R] | Rep. Richard Bennett [R] |
Rep. Scott Bounds [R] | Rep. Chris Brown [R] | Rep. Bryant Clark [D] | Rep. John Hines [D] |
Rep. Stephen Holland [D] | Rep. Nolan Mettetal [R] | Rep. David Myers [D] | Rep. Jerry Turner [R] |
Rep. Percy Watson [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 112 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House Passed (Y: 113 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 112 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House Passed (Y: 113 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | Approved by Governor | |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-04-02 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2019-03-27 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2019-03-26 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Conferees Named Clarke,Wiggins,Branning |
2019-03-21 | House | Conferees Named Read,Mims,Bounds |
2019-03-19 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Amended |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Referred To Appropriations |
2019-02-20 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2019-02-19 | House | Passed |
2019-02-19 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2019-02-18 | House | Referred To Appropriations |