MS HB1648 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 77-3-16, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize The Electronic Submission Of Bids For Public Utility Contracts; To Provide Certain Requirements For Construction Bids That Are Submitted Electronically; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Electronic bids; authorize public utilities to provide system for submittal of as additional option.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-04 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - House Passed (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - House Passed (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | Approved by Governor | |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-04-08 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Passed |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Referred To Energy |
2024-03-08 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2024-03-07 | House | Passed |
2024-02-29 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2024-02-19 | House | Referred To Public Utilities |