MS HB1643 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 25 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-25 - Due From Governor 05/01/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 25 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-25 - Due From Governor 05/01/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Board Of Supervisors Of Forrest County To Contribute Funds To The Association For Retarded Citizens, Big Brothers/big Sisters Of Southeast Mississippi, The Boy Scouts Of America, The Gulf Pine Girl Scout Council, The Hattiesburg Downtown Association, Inc., The Neighborhood Education Enhancement Development Services, The Salvation Army, Pearl River Valley Opportunity, The Pinebelt Association For Community Enhancement, The Hattiesburg Little League Baseball Association, Petal Optimist Club Baseball, First Tee And The Aids Services Coalition; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Forrest County; authorize contributions to various organizations.
Sponsors
Rep. Toby Barker [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-23 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-12 - House - House Passed (Y: 110 N: 8 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-12 - House - House Passed (Y: 110 N: 8 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-25 | Due From Governor 05/01/12 | |
2012-04-25 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2012-04-25 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2012-04-24 | Transmitted To House | |
2012-04-23 | Passed | |
2012-04-19 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2012-04-13 | Referred To Local and Private | |
2012-04-12 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2012-04-12 | Immediate Release | |
2012-04-12 | Passed | |
2012-03-28 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2012-03-26 | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |