MS HB1633 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-13 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-13 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Issuance Of State General Obligation Bonds To Provide Funds To Assist In Paying The Costs Associated With Preconstruction, Design, Engineering, Land Acquisition, Right-of-way Acquisition, Construction And Development Of The Reunion Parkway Project From Bozeman Road To Parkway East In Madison County, Mississippi; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Bonds; authorize issuance for Reunion Parkway project in Madison county.
Sponsors
Rep. Cory Wilson [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-20 - House - House Passed (Y: 79 N: 26 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-13 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Referred To Finance |
2018-02-21 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2018-02-20 | House | Passed |
2018-02-20 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2018-02-14 | House | Referred To Ways and Means |