MS HB1631 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-13 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Authorize The Issuance Of State General Obligation Bonds In The Amount Of $50,000,000.00 To Assist The Rankin-hinds Pearl River Flood And Drainage Control District In The Construction Of A Flood Control Project On The Pearl River In Hinds And Rankin Counties; To Amend Section 57-61-36, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require The Mississippi Development Authority To Use Not More Than $45,000,000.00 Out Of The Unobligated Proceeds Of Bonds Authorized To Be Issued Under The Mississippi Business Investment Act As Grants To Urban Flood Control Districts For The Purpose Of Aiding In The Construction Of A Flood Control Project That Enhances The Economy Of The District Area; To Amend Section 57-61-9, Mississippi Code Of 1972, In Conformity Thereto; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Bonds and grants; authorize to assist the Rank-Hinds Pearl River Flood and Drainage Control District flood control project.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-22 - House - House Passed (Y: 67 N: 37 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House Failed (Y: 57 N: 55 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-13SenateDied In Committee
2018-02-23SenateReferred To Finance
2018-02-23HouseTransmitted To Senate
2018-02-22HousePassed
2018-02-22HouseReconsidered
2018-02-20HouseMotion to Reconsider Entered (Smith, Lamar)
2018-02-20HouseFailed
2018-02-20HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2018-02-14HouseReferred To Ways and Means

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback