MS HB1627 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Failed on April 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Failed on April 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Create New Section 83-1-111, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Exempt Nonprofit Agricultural Membership Organizations From Insurance Regulation; To Provide That A Nonprofit Agricultural Membership Organization May Provide Coverage For Healthcare Benefits Or Services For Its Members And Their Families Pursuant To Contracts Between Members And The Organization Or Its Affiliates; To Provide That A Nonprofit Agricultural Membership Organization Or Its Affiliate Shall Have A Designated Individual Who, In Consultation With The State Insurance Department, Operates As An Ombudsman To Address Concerns From Insured Members Regarding The Namo Plan; To Provide That The State Insurance Department Shall Have The Authority To Review And Comment On The Complaint, Provided That All Complaints Shall Be Investigated And Resolved Solely By The Ombudsman And Namo Or Its Designee; To Provide Certain Requirements For Namo Plans; To Provide That Healthcare Benefits Or Services May Be Sold Or Solicited Only By An Insurance Producer Who Is Both Appointed By An Organization Meeting The Requirements Of This Act And Licensed As An Insurance Producer To Sell Or Solicit Accident And Health Insurance In This State; To Amend Section 83-1-101, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform To The Provisions Of The Act; To Bring Forward Sections 83-5-1 And 83-5-3, Mississippi Code Of 1972, For The Purpose Of Possible Amendment; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Nonprofit Agricultural Membership Organizations; exempt from insurance regulation.
Sponsors
Rep. Clay Deweese [R] | Rep. Jonathon McMillan [R] | Rep. Otis Anthony [D] | Rep. Oscar Denton [D] |
Rep. Vince Mangold [R] | Rep. Lester Carpenter [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-06 - House - House Passed (Y: 116 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-10 | Senate | Died On Calendar |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Referred To Insurance |
2024-03-07 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2024-03-06 | House | Passed |
2024-02-27 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2024-02-19 | House | Referred To Insurance |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
83 | 1 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
83 | 5 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
83 | 5 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |