MS HB1622 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-21 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-21 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act Making An Appropriation For The Purpose Of Funding K-12 And Other Related Educational Activities, Including Certain Agencies And Programs, In The State Of Mississippi, For The Fiscal Year 2011.
Title
Appropriation; State Department of Education - General Programs, Education Reform Act and Vocational Education.
Sponsors
Rep. Tracy Arinder [D] | Rep. Cecil Brown [D] | Rep. Linda Coleman [D] | Rep. Herb Frierson [R] |
Rep. Rufus Straughter [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-21 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - Senate - Senate Motion to Recommit Lost (Y: 19 N: 28 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-04-21 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-16 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-17 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 111 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - Senate - Senate Motion to Recommit Lost (Y: 19 N: 28 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-04-21 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-16 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-17 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 111 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-21 | Approved by Governor | |
2010-05-04 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-04-29 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-04-21 | Conference Report Adopted | |
2010-04-21 | Motion to Recommit Lost | |
2010-04-21 | Conference Report Adopted | |
2010-04-21 | Conference Report Filed | |
2010-04-21 | Conference Report Filed | |
2010-03-25 | Suspend from Deadlines by HC 121 | |
2010-03-22 | Conferees Named Nunnelee,Carmichael,Flowers | |
2010-03-19 | Conferees Named Stringer,Brown,Straughter | |
2010-03-18 | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf | |
2010-03-17 | Returned For Concurrence | |
2010-03-16 | Passed As Amended | |
2010-03-16 | Amended | |
2010-03-09 | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended | |
2010-02-19 | Referred To Appropriations | |
2010-02-19 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2010-02-17 | Passed As Amended | |
2010-02-17 | Amended | |
2010-02-16 | Read the Third Time | |
2010-02-16 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2010-02-15 | Referred To Appropriations |